Hayden et al v. Anderson

Plaintiff: Eugene (I) V. Hayden, Eugene V. Hayden, Bonnie A. Lucara and Bonnie (I) A. Hayden
Defendant: Julie K. Anderson
Case Number: 1:2013cv01017
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/19/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on June 13, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/6/2013. (rpmcd)
June 5, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 8 to and including June 14, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/5/2013.(rpmcd )
June 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Upon review of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Claims by Plaintiffs Eugene V. Hayden and Bonnie A. Lucara 8 filed May 2, 2013, and plaintiffs confession of the motion to dismiss 15 , it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the claims of Eugene V. Hayden and Bonnie A. Lucara are dismissed, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/13/2013.(ervsl, )
June 25, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Second Scheduling Conferencere re 17 : for 7/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/25/2013. (rpmcd)
December 11, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/11/2013. (rpmcd )
April 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/22/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden et al v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene (I) V. Hayden
Represented By: Lance J. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene V. Hayden
Represented By: Lance J. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie A. Lucara
Represented By: Lance J. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie (I) A. Hayden
Represented By: Lance J. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie K. Anderson
Represented By: Deana R. Dagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.