Vigil v. Golden Mardi Gras, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Henry G. Vigil
Defendant: Golden Mardi Gras, Inc. and Affinity Gaming Black Hawk, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01020
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Gilpin
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/2/13. The Scheduling Conference is vacated. (dkals, )
July 3, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay Proceedings by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/3/13. Status Report due by 10/3/2013. (dkals, )
October 4, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Lift Stay of Proceedings by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/4/13. (dkals, )
October 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/26/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/4/13. (sgrim)
November 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Jury Demand [23-1], by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/19/13.(sgrim)
January 17, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/17/14. (sgrim)
May 3, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/23/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/3/13. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Vigil v. Golden Mardi Gras, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry G. Vigil
Represented By: Bruce G. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Mardi Gras, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Gaming Black Hawk, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]