Henry v. Pharmacy Management Services Inc. et al

Defendant: Mark Larivee, Pharmacy Management Services Inc. and College Pharmacy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Henry
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01026
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another Judge. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/7/2013. (klyon, )
June 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/26/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/4/13. (sgrim)
July 11, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 25 , 30 , & 34 ) are DENIED without prejudice as moot as they are targeted at an inoperative pleading. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/11/2013. (klyon, )
August 26, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL. The Motion To Dismiss with Prejudice [# 63 ] as part of the Stipulation of Settlement is GRANTED, any pending motion is DENIED as moot, andthis action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the parties to pay their own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/26/2013. (klyon, )
April 23, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/23/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Henry v. Pharmacy Management Services Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Larivee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Management Services Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: College Pharmacy, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]