Hoyt v. U.S. Bank N.A.

Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Keith Hoyt
Case Number: 1:2013cv01032
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Plaintiffs Motion to Change Case Caption. The Clerk of the Court shall amend the name of the defendant on the electronic docket from U.S. Bancorp, Inc., a Delaware corporation to U.S. Bank N.A., a Delaware corporation. All future filings in this matter shall reflect this amendment of the case caption, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/3/2013.(ervsl, )
December 2, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter remains set for a four-day jury trial to commence on 2/9/2015. By Judge William J. Martinez on 12/2/2014. (alowe)
April 22, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4) (ervsl, )
January 16, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL TRIAL PROCEDURES ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/16/15. Trial Preparation Conference set for 3/24/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2015 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoyt v. U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Stephen M. Dehoff
Represented By: Christine Kessler Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hoyt
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.