Billingsley v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Roy M. Billingsley
Case Number: 1:2013cv01045
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 10/14/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 11/13/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 11/29/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/29/13. (mnfsl, )
July 14, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the Commissioner for further fact finding as directed in this Order pursuant to sentence four in 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/14/2014. (evana, )
October 10, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. Attorney fees in the amount of $4,000.00 are awarded to and shall be paid to Plaintiff under the EAJA but delivered to Plaintiff's attorney. This award is without prejudice to Plaintiff's attorney's right to seek attorney fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406 (b), subject to the offset provisions of the EAJA. See 28 U.S.C. § 2412(c)(1) (2006). By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/10/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingsley v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy M. Billingsley
Represented By: Rachael Adair Lundy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]