Tucker v. Geico Indemnity Company et al

Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Tucker
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01049
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three-day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on May 19, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for April 4, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/31/2013. (rbjsec. )
April 10, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. This civil action and all claims therein are dismissed with prejudice. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/10/14.(jdyne, )
April 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/25/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tucker v. Geico Indemnity Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tucker
Represented By: David L. Kofoed
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]