Hickey v. Donahoe

Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Plaintiff: Lynda S. Hickey
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01054
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Larimer
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 Motion to Compel; denying 26 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/8/13.(bnbcd, )
November 4, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER: Motion to Consolidate EEOC Findings [Doc. # 31 ] is DENIED. The Corrected Motion to Compel the Court's Ruling [Doc. # 32 ] is DENIED. The Motion to Appoint Attorney Per EEOC Findings [Doc. # 33 ] is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/4/2013.(klyon, )
April 24, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/24/2013. (skl)
November 29, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER Adopting in Part and Rejecting in Part 36 Report and Recommendations by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/29/13. The Complaint is dismissed without prejudice.(dkals, )
April 23, 2014 66 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER on 61 Motion to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/23/2014.(athom, )
May 19, 2014 71 Featured Case ORDER denying 69 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate the Scheduling Conference Set for June 12, 2014 and Stay Discovery. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/19/2014. (athom, )
June 11, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART 64 and 65 APRIL 23, 2014 RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendant's 56 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is granted; Plaintiff's 59 Motion for Summary Judg ment is denied; Plaintiff's 72 Motion for Reconsideration is overruled; Defendant's 75 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court is overruled. This case is dismissed. Plaintiff has 30 days from the entry of this order to file an amended complaint clearly alleging a legal claim related to the 2003 Representative Agreement. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/11/2014. (athom, )
June 11, 2014 80 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT re: 79 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Clerk on 06/11/2014. (athom, )
May 13, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/13/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hickey v. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda S. Hickey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]