Miiller v. Prospect Mortgage, LLC

Defendant: Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Otto Miiller
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01079
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 9/23/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/15/13. (sgrim)
December 13, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING TRANSFER: Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 12/13/2013. (trlee, )
February 11, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/11/14. (sgrim)
February 21, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Jury Trial Demand. Trial, if any, in this matter will be to the District Court and not to a jury, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/21/14.(sgrim)
November 12, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Parties Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement and Dismissal of Lawsuit ECF No. 56 is GRANTED. The settlement reached by the Parties represents fair and equitable resolution of this action, reasonably resolves bona fide disag reements between the Parties regarding the merits of the claims asserted by Plaintiff, and demonstrates a good-faith intention by the Parties that the claims of the Plaintiff be fully and finally resolved, and not re-litigated in whole or in part at any point in the future; The settlement reached by the Parties is approved by this Court; Pursuant to the terms of the Parties confidential settlement agreement, the above-captioned action, including Plaintiffs Fair Labor Standards Act claims, and all claims for relief set forth therein, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and Each party shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs, except as may otherwise be provided in the confidential settlement agreement. by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/12/2014.(evana, )
May 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/3/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Miiller v. Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otto Miiller
Represented By: Timothy Clayton Selander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]