Alexander v. NRA Group, LLC

Plaintiff: Carla Alexander
Defendant: NRA Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv01095
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/17/13. (cbssec)
September 13, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice 20 is APPROVED. In accordance therewith, this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party bears its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/13/13. (jjhsl, )
May 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/2/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/21/13. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. NRA Group, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Alexander
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRA Group, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Wienczkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]