Republic of Ecuador, The et al v. Stratus Consulting, Inc.

Petitioner: Diego Garcia Carrion and Republic of Ecuador, The
Respondent: Stratus Consulting, Inc., Ann Maest, David J. Chapman, Jennifer M.H. Peers, David M. Mills and Douglas Beltman
Interested_party: Chevron Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01112
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1782 Assistance to foreign & international tribunals & litigants
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER: The order [# 8 ] referring this case to the magistrate judge respectfully is WITHDRAWN as to the Application [# 1 ], the Motion [# 6 ], the Motion To Intervene [# 20 ], and the Amended Application [# 7 ]. The Republic of Ecuador and Dr. Diego Garca Carrin's Application for the Issuance of Subpoenas Under 28 U.S.C. § 1782(a) to Stratus Consulting, Inc. and Related Individuals for the Taking of a Deposition and the Production of Documents for Use in a Foreign Proceeding ( "the Application") [# 1 ] is DENIED as moot because it has been replaced by the Amended Application [# 7 ]. The Amended Application of the Republic of Ecuador and Dr. Diego Garca Carrin, the Attorney General of the Republic of Ecuador, for the Issuance of Subpoenas under 28 U.S.C. § 1782(a) To Stratus Consulting, Inc. and Related Individuals for the Taking of a Deposition and the Production of Documents for Use In a Foreign Proceeding [# 7 ] is GRANTED IN PART. The subpoena s sought in the Amended Application [# 7 ] SHALL ISSUE forthwith. The Applicant's Motion for Expedited Briefing and Consideration of Application for Discovery (the "Motion") [# 6 ] is DENIED. Chevron Corporation's Unopposed Mot ion for Leave to Intervene in the 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Action Initiated By the Republic of Ecuador and Dr. Diego Garca Carrin (the "Motion To Intervene") [# 20 ] is DENIED without prejudice. A joint proposed Scheduling Order SHALL BE FILED with the Court on or before 6/7/2013. If the parties are unable to agree on a proposed Scheduling Order, counsel SHALL APPEAR in person for a Scheduling Conference on 6/10/2013, at 3:30 p.m. (MDT) before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout St., Denver, Colorado. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/29/2013. (klyon, )
June 5, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER denying 20 Motion to Intervene. Order 23 filed 5/29/13, is VACATED to the extent it denies Chevron Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene in the 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Action Initiated by the Republic of Ecuador And D r. Diego Garcia Carrion 20 filed 5/24/13, for failure to certify compliance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A.. Chevron Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene in the 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Action Initiated by the Republic of Ecuador And Dr. Diego Garcia Carrion 20 filed 5/24/13, is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with the requirements of FED. R. CIV. P. 24(c). By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/5/13.(mjgsl, )
June 10, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Chevron Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene in the 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Action Initiated by the Republic of Ecuador And Dr. Diego Garca Carrin. Chevron Corporation's Complaint in Intervention Accompan ying its Unopposed Motion for Leave to Intervene in the 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Action Initiated by the Republic of Ecuador and Dr. Diego Garca Carrin [#26-1] SHALL BE FILED under a separate docket number as Chevron Corporation's pleading which sets out its claim or defense as an intervenor respondent. The caption of this case SHALL BE AMENDED to show Chevron Corporation as an intervenor respondent. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/10/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Republic of Ecuador, The et al v. Stratus Consulting, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diego Garcia Carrion
Represented By: Eric W. Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Republic of Ecuador, The
Represented By: Eric W. Bloom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stratus Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Heyward Green
Represented By: Stuart Alan Krause
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ann Maest
Represented By: Michael T. Gilbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David J. Chapman
Represented By: Benjamin Heyward Green
Represented By: Stuart Alan Krause
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jennifer M.H. Peers
Represented By: Benjamin Heyward Green
Represented By: Stuart Alan Krause
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David M. Mills
Represented By: Benjamin Heyward Green
Represented By: Stuart Alan Krause
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Douglas Beltman
Represented By: David Richard Fine
Represented By: Charles Edward Swanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: John D. W. Partridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]