Kisskalt v. Fowler

Plaintiff: Eric Adam Kisskalt
Defendant: Adam Fowler
Case Number: 1:2013cv01113
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Protective Order. It is further ORDERED: The Protective Order [12-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/05/2013.(klmcd)
February 7, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/07/14.(jhawk, )
November 21, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 144 is GRANTED. Judgment shall enter in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the three-day jury trial set to commence on Tuesday, January 20, 2015, and the Final Trial Preparation Conference set on Wednesday, January 7, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. are VACATED, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/21/2014.(evana, )
November 21, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Adam Fowler against Eric Adam Kisskalt re: 42 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have its costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen (14) days of entry of judgment, and pursuant to the procedures set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1., by Clerk on 11/21/2014. (evana, )
April 26, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/26/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kisskalt v. Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Adam Kisskalt
Represented By: Jessica Eve Jones
Represented By: David Arthur Lane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Fowler
Represented By: Courtney B. Kramer
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]