Madrid v. Safeway Inc.

Plaintiff: Tonilyn Madrid
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01130
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Otero
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a five day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for June 16, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/25/2013. (rbjsec. )
September 16, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Civil Case Terminated. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/16/13. (alvsl)
May 6, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/06/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Madrid v. Safeway Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonilyn Madrid
Represented By: Gordon J. Heuser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Ian Ray Mitchell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]