Mark G. Glazier Living Trust et al v. Mount Yale Investment Advisors, LLC et al

Defendant: Mount Yale Capital Group, LLC, Mount Yale Private Equity Partners, LLC, Mount Yale Private Equity Fund, L.P., Mount Yale Investment Advisors, LLC, Mount Yale Asset Management, LLC and Mount Yale Guardian Fund, a Series of Mount Yale Master Portfolios, L.P.
Plaintiff: Glazier Family 2004 Irrevocable Trust and Mark G. Glazier Living Trust
Case Number: 1:2013cv01131
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:78 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/3/13. This action is consolidated with 13-cv-01133-CMA-KLM for all purposes.(dkals, )
September 6, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 parties' Joint Agreed Motion Requesting Entry of a Protective Order. Protective Order (34-1), with interlineations, is entered as an Order of the Court, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/6/2013.(mjwcd)
September 6, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/6/2013. (mjwcd)
September 24, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Unopposed Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Stay by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/24/13.(dkals, )
April 30, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/30/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (dkals, )
March 17, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendant's Reply Brief Regarding its Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/17/14.(dkals, )
June 26, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/26/2014. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark G. Glazier Living Trust et al v. Mount Yale Investment Advisors, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Private Equity Partners, LLC
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Private Equity Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Investment Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Guardian Fund, a Series of Mount Yale Master Portfolios, L.P.
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glazier Family 2004 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Peter C. Middleton
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark G. Glazier Living Trust
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Represented By: Peter C. Middleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]