Mark G. Glazier Living Trust et al v. Bowden et al

Defendant: Mount Yale Capital Group, LLC, Mount Yale Private Equity Partners, LLC, Mount Yale Highland Fund, L.P., Mount Yale Investment Advisors, LLC, Mount Yale Asset Management, LLC and Roger C. Bowden
Plaintiff: Glazier Family 2004 Irrevocable Trust and Mark G. Glazier Living Trust
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01133
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:78 Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/12/2013 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/13. (sgrim)
July 3, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases filed in 13-cv-01131-CMA-KLM by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/3/13. This action is consolidated with 13-cv-01131-CMA-KLM for all purposes. (dkals, )
June 26, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/26/2014. (athom, )
May 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order by 7/29/13, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/9/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mark G. Glazier Living Trust et al v. Bowden et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Private Equity Partners, LLC
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Highland Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Investment Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Yale Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Justin Harley Perl
Represented By: Jesse Dean Mondry
Represented By: Martin Shields Fallon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger C. Bowden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glazier Family 2004 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark G. Glazier Living Trust
Represented By: Paul Leo Vorndran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]