Berry v. City of Montrose, Colorado et al.

Defendant: Gary Coram, Larry Abeyta, Michael L. Watson and City of Montrose, Colorado
Plaintiff: Robert Scott Berry
Case Number: 1:2013cv01138
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Montrose
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 8/14/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/3/13. (sgrim)
September 12, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay. All discovery in this matter is hereby stayed pending ruling on 17 , 19 Defendants' Motions toDismiss. The parties shall file a joint status report within seven days of a ruling on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, if any portion of the case remains pending, to advise if the stay should be lifted. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/12/13.(mnfsl, )
March 12, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Gary Coram's FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss 17 is GRANTED in part. Mr. Berry's third and fourth claims are dismissed without prejudice. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss 19 filed by defendants City of Mo ntrose, Michael L. Watson, and Lenny Abeyta is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff's first claim for relief is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's second claim for relief is dismissed. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/12/14.(jhawk, )
March 14, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants CITY OF MONTROSE, MICHAEL L. WATSON, LARRY ABEYTA, and GARY CORAM. ORDERED that defendants are AWARDED their costs, to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Clerk on 03//14/14. (jhawk, )
May 9, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order on or before 7/29/13, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/9/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. City of Montrose, Colorado et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Coram
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Abeyta
Represented By: Gillian Marie Fahlsing
Represented By: Monica N. Kovaci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Watson
Represented By: Gillian Marie Fahlsing
Represented By: Monica N. Kovaci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Montrose, Colorado
Represented By: Gillian Marie Fahlsing
Represented By: Monica N. Kovaci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scott Berry
Represented By: John W. McKendree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]