Weaver et al v. Meek et al

Defendant: David James Meek, Richelle Marie Meek and USA
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Bassett-Weaver and Steven C. Weaver
Counter_claimant: USA
Counter_defendant: Pamela J. Bassett-Weaver and Steven C. Weaver
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01142
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Alamosa
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Action affecting property on which US has lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/06/2013. (rbjsec. )
September 6, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal re: 21 Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' counterclaims against Plaintiffs are DISMISSED, and that the United States is DISMISSED from this lawsuit with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and 41( a)(2), with each of the affected parties to bear its own costs and fees; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is amended accordingly. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/06/13. (alvsl)
February 10, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Motion to Remand to State Court, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/10/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Weaver et al v. Meek et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David James Meek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richelle Marie Meek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J. Bassett-Weaver
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Motz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Weaver
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Motz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: USA
Represented By: Lindsay Laurie Clayton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pamela J. Bassett-Weaver
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Motz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Steven C. Weaver
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Motz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]