Woodstock v. Bergondo et al

Defendant: Paul Larson, Carol Brown, Mike Bergondo, Tracy Swindler and Kathleen Boyd
Plaintiff: Jonathan Woodstock
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01146
Filed: April 30, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/9/13. (nmmsl, )
May 2, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/02/13. (nmmsl, )
March 17, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 43 ] filed February 6, 2014, is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 49 ] filed February 25, 2014, is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. Defendant Betty Spinuzzi's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [# 23 ] filed Aug. 9, 2013, is GRANTED. The Motion To DismissPlaintiff's Amended Complaint [# 28 ] filed by defendants Boyd, Hodge, Phillips,Larson, and Brown on September 9, 2013, is GRANTED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/17/2014.(klyon, )
March 17, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Hodge, Martin, Spanozi, Carol Brown, Kathleen Boyd, Paul Larson, Sharron Phillips against Jonathan Woodstock re: 50 Order, by Clerk on 3/17/2014. (klyon, )
May 13, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/13/13. (nmmsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Woodstock v. Bergondo et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Larson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Bergondo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Swindler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Boyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Woodstock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]