Hamilton v. Fernandez Ely

Defendant: Erin Fernandez Ely
Plaintiff: Jan B. Hamilton
Case Number: 1:2013cv01150
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Petition for Extension of Time; denying as premature 9 Petition for Court Appointed Attorney in Civil Case; ORDERED that Plaintiff shall assert her constitutional claims on the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form. The Court will not consider her claims as presented in the 10 Petition for Constitutional Challenge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/21/2013.(skl)
July 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies; denying 15 Motion to Clarify and Update; request for appointment of counsel is denied as premature, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/02/2013.(skl)
August 28, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/28/13. (dkals, )
September 26, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration and denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/26/2013.(trlee, )
May 1, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/01/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Fernandez Ely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Fernandez Ely
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan B. Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]