Cooper v. Ducharme et al

Defendant: Dave (I) Booth, Dave Booth, Art (I) Ducharme and Art Ducharme
Plaintiff: Cory Cooper
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01154
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss. The minute order at entry 24 is AMENDED to grant Plaintiff an extension of time through November 4, 2013 to file an amended pleading as a matter of course, pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1). Minute Order strik ing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 26 is VACATED and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is REINSTATED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint no later than June 5, 2014. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/15/2014.(trlee, )
May 13, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff To File Supplement, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/13/13. (nmmsl, )
June 28, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge; denying as unnecessary 7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 6/28/2013.(skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cooper v. Ducharme et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave (I) Booth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Booth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art (I) Ducharme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Ducharme
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]