Artino v. Adams County et al

Defendant: Charity Ruth Grimsley Hinkley, Douglas N. Darr, Erik Born, Adams County Sheriff's Office and Adams County
Plaintiff: Benedetto Artino
Case Number: 1:2013cv01155
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/7/2013. (mjwcd)
June 19, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Stipulated Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference 6/24/2013 01:30 PM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 8/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/19/2013.(mjwcd)
August 15, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set 8/19/2013 02:00 PM is vacated. Scheduling Conference reset for 9/16/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/15/2013.(mjwcd)
September 9, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint 24 is accepted for filing as of the date of this order, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/9/2013.(mjwcd)
October 15, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 37 Defendant Charity Ruth Grimsley Hinkley's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/15/13.(mnfsl, )
October 24, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Defendant Charity Ruth Grimsley Hinkley's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Paragraph 3.c. (Statement of Claims and Defenses) of the Scheduling Order 36 is amended as set forth in the subject motion. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/24/2013.(mjwcd)
March 24, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Motion to Compel. On or before April 3, 2014, plaintiff shall provide a supplemental response to defendant Charity Ruth Grimsley Hinkley's interrogatory. Defendant Charity Ruth Grimsley Hinkleys request for fees and sanctions are DENIED by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 03/24/14.(jhawk, )
April 17, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Civil Scheduling Order. Scheduling Order 36 is amended. Discovery due by 8/29/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2014. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/17/2014.(emill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Artino v. Adams County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charity Ruth Grimsley Hinkley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas N. Darr
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Born
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams County
Represented By: Heidi M. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benedetto Artino
Represented By: John Philip McDonnell, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]