American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. v. Stevens et al

Defendant: Earl Stevens and Twila Stevens
Plaintiff: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01159
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Plaintiff American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ.P. 12(b)(6), by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/18/2013.(ervsl, )
February 5, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendants' Counterclaim Instanter. ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the attached Plaintiff's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaim for filing by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/05/14.(jhawk, )
May 13, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/13/14. On or before May 27, 2014, the parties shall file a stipulation or motion to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery 32 is DENIED as moot. (bsimm, )
July 7, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice. Each party to pay her or its own attorney's fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/07/14. (jhawk, )
May 10, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/10/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. v. Stevens et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Stevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twila Stevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]