Purzel Video GmbH v. Does 115, 116, 117, 119, 121, 123, 124, 125, 127, 128, 129, 130, 133, 137, 139, 140, 144, 147, 148, 149, 150, 151, 153, 154 and 155

Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH
Defendant: Does 115, 116, 117, 119, 121, 123, 124, 125, 127, 128, 129, 130, 133, 137, 139, 140, 144, 147, 148, 149, 150, 151, 153, 154 and 155
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01171
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/7/2013. (mehcd)
July 18, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Doe No. 129 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 07/18/13. (jjhsl, )
August 6, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant Doe Nos. 115, 121, 127, 139, 147, and 154 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Doe Nos. 119, 124, 125, 148, and 150 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 08/06/13. (jjhsl, )
October 8, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER In accordance with the Notice of Dismissal of Chad Peterson Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed on October 8, 2013 ECF No. 31 , it is ORDERED that Defendant Chad Peterson is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/8/2013. (ervsl, )
November 12, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 42 Plaintiff's Motion and Memorandum for Default Judgment against Defendant James Warren, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/12/2013. (mehcd)
January 6, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Amended Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 53 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Motion and Memorandum for Default Judgment Against Defendant James Warren 46 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in Plaintiffs favor against Defendant James Warren. ORDERED that Defendant Warren shall pay Plaintiff the sum of $2,500.00 in statutory damages and $726.66 for attorney's fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/14.(jjhsl, )
January 6, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 51 is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Renewed Motion and Memorandum to Dismiss Defendant St. Pierre& #039;s Counterclaims and to Strike Defendant St. Pierres Affirmative Defenses at 19, 20, 22, 23, 21(2nd), 22(2nd), and 26 filed November 15, 2013 49 is GRANTED. St. Pierre's Counterclaims are DISMISSED. St. Pierre's affirmative defens es of unclean hands ( 19), failure to mitigate and no damages ( 20, 21(2nd)), copyright validity, lack of originality, and lack of proof ( 22, 23, and 22(2nd)), and grossly excessive damages ( 26) are STRICKEN by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/14.(jjhsl, )
January 6, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended 54 Order Affirming and Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/06/14. (jjhsl, )
January 27, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE With Prejudice by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/27/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Purzel Video GmbH v. Does 115, 116, 117, 119, 121, 123, 124, 125, 127, 128, 129, 130, 133, 137, 139, 140, 144, 147, 148, 149, 150, 151, 153, 154 and 155
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purzel Video GmbH
Represented By: Paul Alan Lesko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 115, 116, 117, 119, 121, 123, 124, 125, 127, 128, 129, 130, 133, 137, 139, 140, 144, 147, 148, 149, 150, 151, 153, 154 and 155
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]