Tope v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Russell Tope
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01178
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Dolores
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/23/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/23/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 11/7/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/12/13. (mnfsl, )
November 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/26/2013.(klyon, )
November 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 22 Order, by Clerk on 11/26/2013. (klyon, )
December 27, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Plaintiff is awarded EAJA attorney fees in the amount of $ 3,474.38, to be made payable to Plaintiff, Russell Tope, and mailed to counsel of record. By Judge John L. Kane on 12/27/2013.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Tope v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Tope
Represented By: Robert C. Dawes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]