Locke v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Abby M. Locke
Case Number: 1:2013cv01184
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/13/2013 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/23/2013. (klyon, )
August 16, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 8/16/13. (msksec, )
October 16, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 18 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Concerning30(b)(6) Deposition of American Family Mutual Insurance Company. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/16/2013.(klyon, )
December 13, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint toAdd Claim for Punitive Damages and to Amend Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/13/2013.(klyon, )
January 3, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff for Purposes of Allowing Deposition of Defendant's Retained Expert, John Craver. Discovery due by 1/24/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/3/2014.(klyon, )
September 16, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and denying American Family's request for attorney fees, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/15/14.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locke v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacquelyn S. Booker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abby M. Locke
Represented By: Robert E. Markel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]