STERISIL, INC. v. PROEDGE DENTAL PRODUCTS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: Sterisil, Inc
Defendant: Proedge Dental Products, Inc and Mark A. Frampton
Case Number: 1:2013cv01210
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Exhibit toPlaintiff's Claim Construction Brief. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/10/2013.(klyon, )
March 19, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Concerning Appointment of Master. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/19/2014. (klyon, )
September 26, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 27 Motion for Leave to Allow Expert Testimony of Sterisil Founder and Employee Bradley Downs During a Technology Tutorial or at the Markman Hearing by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 09/26/14.(jhawk, )
February 24, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONCERNING APPOINTMENT OF MASTER: The proposed master, Gary B. Chapman, Ph.D., J.D. of the law firm Lathrop & Gage LLP, in Boulder, Colorado, through counsel for the defendants, SHALL FILE a brief statement indicating whether he will accept an appointment by this court to serve as a master in this case by 3/7/2015. If the proposed master is willing to accept such an appointment, then by 3/7/2015, the proposed master SHALL FILE, through counsel for the defendants, an affidavit which sati sfies the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 53(b)(3)(A). If such an affidavit is filed by the proposed master and there is no ground for disqualification, then the court SHALL ISSUE an order appointing Dr. Chapman to serve as master in this case. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/24/2015. (alowe)
May 8, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Briefing on Markman Issues. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/8/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STERISIL, INC. v. PROEDGE DENTAL PRODUCTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterisil, Inc
Represented By: Ramon Luis Pizarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proedge Dental Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]