Hemphill v. Ace Adjustment Co., Inc.

Defendant: Ace Adjustment Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hemphill
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01214
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER: 15 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/10/13. (bnbcd, )
December 3, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER discharging 20 Order to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/3/13. (dkals, )
May 22, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 05/22/13. (alvsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hemphill v. Ace Adjustment Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Adjustment Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hemphill
Represented By: Lark H. Fogel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]