Boyle v. Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford

Defendant: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Plaintiff: Barbara Boyle
Case Number: 1:2013cv01223
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a Scheduling Conference on 7/3/2013 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/21/13. (cbssec)
March 3, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/3/2014. ORDERED: 25 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is GRANTED. The Discovery deadline is extended to 3/31/2014. The Dispositive Motions deadline is extended to 4/14/2014. FTR: Courtroom A402 - C. Covington. (ccovi)
March 13, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 03/13/2014. (cbslc1)
April 11, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Dismiss, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/11/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle v. Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property & Casualty Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Stephen Eugene Baumann, II
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Brooks, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Boyle
Represented By: Michael Graves Brownlee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]