Lucero v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Susan Ann Lucero
Case Number: 1:2013cv01233
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 11/12/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 12/12/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 12/27/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/30/13. (mnfsl, )
December 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. By Judge John L. Kane on 12/17/2013.(klyon, )
December 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 17 Order, by Clerk on 12/17/2013. (klyon, )
March 6, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees. By Judge John L. Kane on 3/6/2014.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucero v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ann Lucero
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.