Williams v. Westwood College

Defendant: Westwood College
Plaintiff: Dale I Williams
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01281
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 7/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/13/2013. (mjwcd)
August 7, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The 25 Motion to Dismiss Case Without Predjudice (sic) is granted. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/7/13.(mnfsl, )
May 31, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/31/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams v. Westwood College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwood College
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale I Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]