Miller v. Mills et al.

Defendant: US Small Business Administration and Karen G. Mills
Plaintiff: Darrell Miller
Case Number: 1:2013cv01285
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Park
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting case for trial: Trial Preparation Conference set for 11/12/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 601 before Judge Raymond P. Moore. A five day Bench Trial is set to commence 12/15/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Raymond P. Moore. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/21/2014. (trlee, )
October 10, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 35 Motion in Limine. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/10/2014. The clerk shall enter judgment as set forth herein in favor of defendant. (trlee, )
May 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 05/20/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Attachment) (alvsl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Mills et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Small Business Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen G. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Miller
Represented By: Brian Herbert Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.