Fritz v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Beth M. Fritz
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv01305
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 9/30/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 10/30/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 11/14/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 8/21/13. (mnfsl, )
November 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Remand. The Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) with a remand of the cause to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/25/13.(mnfsl, )
November 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 22 Order. By Clerk on 11/25/13. (mnfsl, )
February 5, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion for Attorney Fees Under EAJA. By Judge John L. Kane on 2/5/2014.(klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fritz v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth M. Fritz
Represented By: Frederick W. Newall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.