Baker v. State of Colorado, et al

Defendant: Colorado Attorney General and State of Colorado, The
Plaintiff: Brandon Baker
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01334
Filed: May 21, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Plaintiff shall file a Response to the 14 MOTION to Dismiss on or before 10/3/13. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/13.(mnfsl, )
February 18, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER. The 14 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge is adopted. Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(5) is granted in part. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/18/14.(mfiel, )
May 23, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/23/2013. (skl)
June 12, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Pleading, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/12/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Baker v. State of Colorado, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Attorney General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]