Reyes v. Tempo Financial Holdings Corporation

Defendant: Tempo Financial Holdings Corporation
Plaintiff: Luis Fernando Reyes
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01704
Filed: June 27, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER re 11 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/27/2013. (rpmcd )
February 6, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Status Report due by 2/17/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/6/2014. (rpmcd)
February 21, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR CLARIFICATION re 17 : parties shall file statements clarifying this apparent contradiction by 2/28/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/21/2014. (rpmcd)
August 30, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/17/2013 at 10:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on October 10, 2013 and lead counsel present in person. Initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/30/2013. (rpmcd)
August 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : counsel for the defendant shall file a disclosure statement pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.4., by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/30/2013. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Reyes v. Tempo Financial Holdings Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempo Financial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Scott Leonard Evans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Fernando Reyes
Represented By: James Alexander Dumas, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]