Culbertson v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Courtney Culbertson
Case Number: 1:2013cv01913
Filed: July 18, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 11/27/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 12/27/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 1/13/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 10/16/13. (mnfsl, )
March 6, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: SSA's decision is reversed and this case is remanded to SSA for further administrative proceedings. Costs are awarded Ms. Culbertson. Ms. Culbertson shall file any motion for attorney's fees by 3/19/2015. Government shall file its response by 4/2/2015, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/6/2015. (ebuch)
March 6, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Courtney Culbertson against Carolyn W. Colvin pursuant to 20 Order, by Clerk on 3/6/2015. (ebuch)
March 17, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Order Approving Stipulation of Award of Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/17/2015. (ebuch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culbertson v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Culbertson
Represented By: Diane Katherine Bross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.