Carr v. Miller et al

Respondent: Mike Miller and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Petitioner: Christopher Carr
Case Number: 1:2013cv01951
Filed: July 22, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Crowley
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action, and denying without prejudice leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/3/13. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )
January 29, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion Pursuant to Rule 61 Harmless Error, and denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and 16 Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/29/14.(dkals, )
July 23, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/23/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Miller et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Miller
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Represented By: John D. Seidel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Carr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]