Candelaria v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: David S. Candelaria
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01956
Filed: July 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Conejos
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 13 Featured Case JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 12/30/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 1/30/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 2/14/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/14/13. (mnfsl, )
January 29, 2014 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/29/14.(mfiel, )
January 29, 2014 17 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT, re: 16 Order. By Clerk on 1/29/14. (mfiel, )
April 9, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Attorney Fees, by Judge John L. Kane on 4/9/2014.(trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Candelaria v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Candelaria
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]