Diaz Rodriguez et al v. Luna et al

Defendant: John Luna and Leticia Jael Rodriguez Cisneros
Plaintiff: Javier Pimentel and Nancy Diaz Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2013cv02223
Filed: August 19, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/1/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and the Trial Preparation Conference are set for 8/8/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Four (4) day Jury Trial set for 8/25/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/20/13. (rebsec, )
March 5, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant Azteca Ranch Market. Plaintiffs are granted an extension to April 1, 2014, to serve Defendant Azteca Ranch Market #3, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/5/14.(sgrim)
August 6, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Motion to Vacate Final Pretrial and Trial Preparation Conferences set August 8, 2014. Telephonic setting conference is set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/6/2014.(trlee, )
August 5, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving juror questionnaire, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 juror questionnaire) (trlee, )
August 20, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 62 Report and Recommendations. Denying 21 Motion to Dismiss, denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, denying 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is closed, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/20/2014.(trlee, )
August 23, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/20/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/23/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz Rodriguez et al v. Luna et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Luna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leticia Jael Rodriguez Cisneros
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Pimentel
Represented By: Patrick Andrew McKay
Represented By: Douglas Leo Romero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Diaz Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas Leo Romero
Represented By: Patrick Andrew McKay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]