Davis v. Falk et al

Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and James Falk
Petitioner: Glenn Davis
Case Number: 1:2013cv02494
Filed: September 12, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Accept Habeas Corpus as 'Timely Filed' and 15 Second Motion for Appointment of Counsel for Habeas Corpus, dismissing this action, and denying without prejudice leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/5/13. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )
September 13, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/13/2013. (skl)
October 7, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Second ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/07/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Falk et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glenn Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]