Binion v. USA

Defendant: USA
Plaintiff: Barbara Binion
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02602
Filed: September 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER. A trial to the court shall commence December 8, 2014, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. A combined Trial Preparation Conference and Final Pretrial Conference shall commence on November 6, 2014, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom C-201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The proposed Final Pretrial Order is due on or before October 30, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/21/14. (sgrim)
March 5, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 21-2), by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/5/14.(sgrim)
August 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 25 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(1). (Doc. No. 25-1.) Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss no later than September 10, 2014. Defendant may file a reply no later than September 24, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/21/14.(morti, )
October 31, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/31/14 granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and denying as moot 31 Motion for Leave to Appear By Telephone. This action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant may have its costs by filing a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of Court within fourteen days of the entry of judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1.(nmarb, )
October 31, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against Barbara Binion re: 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, on 10/31/14. (nmarb, )
December 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/28/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/23/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Binion v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Represented By: Katherine Mesenbring Field
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Binion
Represented By: David J. Webster
Represented By: William George Fischer, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]