Cellect LLC v. HTC America, Inc.

Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cellect LLC
Case Number: 1:2013cv02604
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part 19 Joint Motion to Vacate Pending Deadlines and Set Telephone Status Conference by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/7/14. The Scheduling Conference is reset to 2/18/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204, before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, and a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/30/2014 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (dkals, )
April 11, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 30 Order to Show Cause. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 04/11/2014. (athom, )
June 6, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. All present claims and counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/06/2014. (athom, )
June 6, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT re: 47 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Clerk on 06/06/2014. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellect LLC v. HTC America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellect LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli, Jr.
Represented By: John C. Heuton
Represented By: Benjamin Baughman Lieb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]