Nguyen v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Quoc Nguyen
Case Number: 1:2013cv02609
Filed: September 24, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Joint Case Management Plan for Social Security Cases. SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/21/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/20/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 7/7/2014 by Judge John L. Kane on 04/15/14. (jhawk, )
September 11, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Clerk of the Court is therefore directed to reassign this case pursuant to the Pilot Program to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/11/14. (jhawk, )
January 12, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 10 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/12/15. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (lgale, )
January 12, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Carolyn W. Colvin against Quoc Nguyen re: 34 Order by Clerk on 1/12/15. (morti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quoc Nguyen
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]