Little Sisters of the Poor Home for the Aged, Denver, Colorado et al v. Kathleen Sebelius et al

Defendant: Thomas E. Perez, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Labor, Jacob J. Lew and United States Department of the Treasury
Plaintiff: Christian Brothers Employee Benefit Trust, Christian Brothers Services, Little Sisters of the Poor, Baltimore, Inc. and Little Sisters of the Poor Home for the Aged, Denver, Colorado
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02611
Filed: September 24, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/16/2013. (ervsl, )
December 27, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction ECF No. 15 is DENIED; Defendants Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment ECF No. 30 is DENIED to the extent it seeks dismissal of this case for lack of standing. The Court RESERVES RULING on the remainder of the issues raised in the Motion to Dismiss, by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/27/2013.(ervsl, )
December 31, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER denying 54 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction pending appeal on 12/31/13.(dbrow, )
January 7, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER By an Order Doc. # 11 entered on October 11, 2013, I set this matter for a scheduling conference on January VACATED; The plaintiffs shall file a status report on or before the earlier of the following: (i) a ruling by the district judge on Plaintiffs Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal Doc. # 54 ; or (ii) April 7, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/7/2014. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Little Sisters of the Poor Home for the Aged, Denver, Colorado et al v. Kathleen Sebelius et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob J. Lew
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Bradley Philip Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Brothers Employee Benefit Trust
Represented By: Daniel Howard Blomberg
Represented By: Adle Auxier Keim
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Carl C. Scherz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Brothers Services
Represented By: Daniel Howard Blomberg
Represented By: Adle Auxier Keim
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Carl C. Scherz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Sisters of the Poor, Baltimore, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Howard Blomberg
Represented By: Adle Auxier Keim
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Carl C. Scherz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Sisters of the Poor Home for the Aged, Denver, Colorado
Represented By: Adle Auxier Keim
Represented By: Daniel Howard Blomberg
Represented By: Mark Leonard Rienzi
Represented By: Seth Michael Roberts
Represented By: Carl C. Scherz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]