USA v. $50,188.00 in United States Currency et al

Defendant: 2008 Honda Accord, VIN 1HGCP36828A085907, 2010 Land Rover, VIN SALFR2BN9AH154643, 2012 Honda CR-V, VIN 5J6RM4H76CL071091, $771.29 Seized From First Bank Account #2573037347, $2,964.28 Seized From Wells Fargo Account #2246582312, $50,188.00 in United States Currency and $1,656.36 Seized From First Bank Account #2575026253
Plaintiff: USA
Claimant: Song Q. Yu, Fu Zhen Huang and Jie Yu
Case Number: 1:2013cv02652
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Claimants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture One Day Late, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/12/2013. (eseam)
May 2, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Motion to Be Excused From Status Conference. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/2/2014.(klyon, )
May 5, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court Final ORDER of Forfeiture Only as to Certain Defendant Properties. Forfeiture of a. $29,103.00 of defendant $50,188.00 in United States currency;b. defendant $771.29 seized from First Bank account #2573037347; andc. defendant 2010 Land Rover, VIN SALFR2BN9AH154643 shall enter in favor of the United States. A Certificate of Reasonable Cause, which this Order constitutes, is granted as to these defendant properties pursuant to 28 U.S.C.' 2465. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/5/2014. (klyon, )
May 5, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of USA against $50,188.00 in United States Currency, $771.29 Seized From First Bank Account #2573037347, 2010 Land Rover, VIN SALFR2BN9AH154643 re: 34 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property,, by Clerk on 5/5/2014. (klyon, )
June 12, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Final ORDER of Forfeiture Only as to Certain Defendants. Forfeiture ofa. $2,964.28 Seized From Wells Fargo Account #2246582312; b. $1,656.36 Seized From First Bank Account #2575026253; and c. 2012 Honda CR-V, VIN 5J6RM4H76CL071091 shall enter in favor of the United States. A Certificate of Reasonable Cause is granted as to these defendant assets. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/12/2014.(klyon, )
June 12, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Final JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 38 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property, by Clerk on 6/12/2014. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $50,188.00 in United States Currency et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Honda Accord, VIN 1HGCP36828A085907
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2010 Land Rover, VIN SALFR2BN9AH154643
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Honda CR-V, VIN 5J6RM4H76CL071091
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $771.29 Seized From First Bank Account #2573037347
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,964.28 Seized From Wells Fargo Account #2246582312
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $50,188.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,656.36 Seized From First Bank Account #2575026253
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Wayne Campbell
Represented By: Tonya Shotwell Andrews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Song Q. Yu
Represented By: Jeralyn E. Merritt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Fu Zhen Huang
Represented By: Jeralyn E. Merritt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jie Yu
Represented By: Jeralyn E. Merritt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]