Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition v. Regional Transportation District (RTD)

Defendant: Regional Transportation District
Plaintiff: Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02760
Filed: October 10, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 15 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Plaintiff's Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. The written Stipulated Protective Order (13-1) is approved as amended in paragraph 8 and made an Order of Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/2014.(mjwcd)
January 14, 2014 16 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/14/2014. (mjwcd)
February 26, 2014 25 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. T he case was dismissed with prejudice as of the entry of the parties' stipulated motion to dismiss with prejudice. No order of dismissal is necessary by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/26/14. (jhawk, )
October 22, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/22/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition v. Regional Transportation District (RTD)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Transportation District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Cross-Disability Coalition
Represented By: Kevin William Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]