Nelms v. Colvin

Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Dominic T. Nelms
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02916
Filed: October 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2014 15 Featured Case JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER), SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 5/9/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 6/9/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 6/24/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 2/25/2014. (trlee, )
July 10, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Remand. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgmentin accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993) by Judge John L. Kane on 07/10/14.(jhawk, )
July 10, 2014 21 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT. Final judgment is hereby entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58, consistent with the United States Supreme Court's decision in Shalala v. Schaefer, 509 U.S. 292, 296-302 (1993). Plaintiff may have her costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs within fourteen days of entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1 by Clerk on 07/10/14. (jhawk, )
August 27, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. It is ORDERED that the Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $13,789.48. No application for additional fees in pursuit of this fee request will be entertained, by Judge John L. Kane on 08/27/2014. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nelms v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic T. Nelms
Represented By: Gordon W. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]