Headley v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Patricia Lee Headley
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2013cv02989
Filed: October 31, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER- JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 3/31/2014. SS Defendants Brief due by 4/30/2014. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 5/15/2014. By Judge John L. Kane on 2/27/2014. (trlee, )
March 31, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this case is REVERSED AND REMANDED to the Commissioner for further fact finding as directed in this Order pursuant to sentence four in 42 U.S.C.§ 405(g)., by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/31/2015. (evana, )
March 31, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Patricia Lee Headley against Carolyn W. Colvin re: 19 Order that the decision of Commissioner of Social Security is reversed and remanded. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have its costs by the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of this Court within fourteen (14) days of entry of judgment, and pursuant to the procedures set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1., by Clerk on 3/31/2015. (evana, )
November 6, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. By Judge John L. Kane on 11/6/13.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Headley v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Lee Headley
Represented By: Ann J. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]