Berry v. Doc Popcorn Development, Inc. et al

Defendant: Doc Popcorn International, Inc and Doc Popcorn Development, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kary Berry
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv03114
Filed: November 15, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/25/2013. (mjwcd)
January 31, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Scheduling Conference. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/31/2014.(klyon, )
February 18, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated ProtectiveOrder. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/18/2014.(klyon, )
February 18, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/18/2014. (klyon, )
May 6, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Discovery and To Quash Depostion [sic] Notices. The Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Discovery and Quash Depostion [sic] Notices Pending Decision on Pending Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 34 ) is withdrawn without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 5/6/2014.(klyon, )
May 27, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice [# 45 ] filed May 23, 2014, is APPROVED. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/27/2014. (klyon, )
November 15, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. by Bruce Langer, District Court Judge on 11/1/2013. (dbera, )
November 15, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Clarify. by Bruce Langer, District Court Judge on 11/6/2013. (dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Berry v. Doc Popcorn Development, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Popcorn International, Inc
Represented By: Andrew Paul Beilfuss(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher Phillips Brown
Represented By: Kevin Paul Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Popcorn Development, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Phillips Brown
Represented By: Andrew Paul Beilfuss(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kevin Paul Perez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kary Berry
Represented By: Paul Matthew Grant(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]