RE/MAX Relocation, Inc. v. Valero Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: RE/MAX Relocation, Inc.
Defendant: Valero Services, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2014cv00022
Filed: January 3, 2014
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM, OPINION And Order: Plaintiff RMR's Motion for Summary Judgment [ 15] is granted as to Defendant Valero's liability for breach of the Agreement; Defendant Valero's Motion for Summary Judgment 18 is denied; and on or before September 15, 2014 RMR will move for an award of the attorneys' fees and costs it incurred in defending the California Litigation and in bringing this action against Valero. RMRs motion for attorneys' fees must comply withLocal Civil Rule 54.3. Valero will have up to and including October 6, 2014 to respond, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/26/2014. (jsmit)
October 1, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Stipulated 29 Notice of Settlement : Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's pending Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is hereby VACATED re 28 (terminated), Parties are ordered to submit proper dismissal papers pursuant to the terms of their settlement by October 14, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2014. (jsmit)
January 28, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/20/2014 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 13, 2014, lead counsel present in person, initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) will be completed no later than 10 calendar days before the scheduling conference, and counsel shall file their respective disclosure statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/28/2014. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: RE/MAX Relocation, Inc. v. Valero Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE/MAX Relocation, Inc.
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brice Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]