Donahue v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kevin Donahue
 
Case Number: 1:2014cv01013
Filed: April 9, 2014
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint and Jury Demand by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/16/14.(dkals, )
June 27, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/27/14. (msksec, )
August 28, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Corey R. O'Neal as Counsel of Record by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/28/14.(dkals, )
May 9, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/9/14. Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. (bsimm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Donahue v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Donahue
Represented By: Corey R. O'Neal
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Springer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]