Brown v. Bach et al

Defendant: S. Worley, Peter Cariey, Steve Bach and J. Ragland
Plaintiff: Shaun Eric Brown
 
Case Number: 1:2014cv01015
Filed: April 8, 2014
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; Plaintiff's 12 Motion asking the Court to order Defendants to make admissions is DENIED as premature. Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/29/14.(morti, )
July 24, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Amended In Forma Pauperis Motion; The motion titled 14 Motin [sic]: Request for Admission is denied as premature, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 7/24/14.(morti, )
September 5, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/5/14. (dkals, )
September 9, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/9/14. (dkals, )
April 17, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/2014. (morti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Bach et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Worley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Cariey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ragland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Eric Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]